NJ A2840 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1960
Note: Carry Over of previous A5027
Note: Carry Over of previous S3604
Note: Carry Over of previous A5027
Note: Carry Over of previous S3604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs certain unclaimed water utility deposits in Unclaimed Utility Deposits Trust Fund be paid to Statewide nonprofit utility assistance organizations meeting certain eligibility criteria.
Title
Directs certain unclaimed water utility deposits in Unclaimed Utility Deposits Trust Fund be paid to Statewide nonprofit utility assistance organizations meeting certain eligibility criteria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2840 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5027 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2140 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3604 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5027 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2140 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3604 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2840 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2840_I1.HTM |