NJ A3082 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1683
Note: Carry Over of previous S2076
Note: Carry Over of previous A3678
Note: Carry Over of previous S2076
Note: Carry Over of previous A3678
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes executor or administrator to take control of online accounts of deceased person.
Title
Authorizes executor or administrator to take control of online accounts of deceased person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3082 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1062 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2076 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3678 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1062 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2076 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3678 (Carry Over) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3082 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3082_I1.HTM |