NJ A323 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5824
Note: Carry Over of previous S3986
Note: Carry Over of previous S3986
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits member of Judicial Retirement System to defer retirement to serve as county prosecutor.
Title
Permits member of Judicial Retirement System to defer retirement to serve as county prosecutor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5824 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S3986
S3986 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.287.
S3986 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.287.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A323 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/323_I1.HTM |