NJ A3292 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1864
Note: Carry Over of previous S490
Note: Carry Over of previous S490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2178 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2178 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals family cap in Work First New Jersey program.
Title
Repeals family cap in Work First New Jersey program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2178 (1R) |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1864 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2178 (Same As) 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.99.
S490 (Carry Over) 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2178 (Same As) 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.99.
S490 (Carry Over) 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee