NJ A3529 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-02 - Approved P.L.2013, c.176.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-02 - Approved P.L.2013, c.176.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Paterson Plank Road bridge in the Town of Secaucus as "Joseph F. Tagliareni, Jr. Memorial Bridge."
Title
Designates Paterson Plank Road bridge in the Town of Secaucus as "Joseph F. Tagliareni, Jr. Memorial Bridge."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2701 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2701 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.176. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2701 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2701 (Same As) 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A3529