NJ A3596 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2393 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2393 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain conveyances of graves, crypts and niches from 15% fee charged by cemetery company.
Title
Excludes certain conveyances of graves, crypts and niches from 15% fee charged by cemetery company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted by S2393 (1R) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2393 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3596 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3596_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3596_R1.HTM |