NJ A3637 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2821
Note: Carry Over of previous S1938
Note: Carry Over of previous S1938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides immunity from civil and criminal liability for rescue of animal from motor vehicle under inhumane conditions.
Title
Provides immunity from civil and criminal liability for rescue of animal from motor vehicle under inhumane conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2821 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S1938 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S80 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1938 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S80 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3637 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3637_I1.HTM |