NJ A3654 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2333 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by S2333 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJT to establish office of real estate economic development and transit-oriented development; requires annual report of certain real property information.
Title
Requires NJT to establish office of real estate economic development and transit-oriented development; requires annual report of certain real property information.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S2333 (2R) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tully) |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2333 (Same As) 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.135.