NJ A3659 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCF to develop and adopt Statewide youth suicide prevention plan.
Title
Requires DCF to develop and adopt Statewide youth suicide prevention plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S2719 (1R) | |
2011-09-19 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Angelini) | |
2011-02-10 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2719 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A3659 (1R)