NJ A3666 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2173

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public works contractors to have certain certifications; requires certain contractors to participate in apprenticeship program.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public works contractors to have certain certifications; requires certain contractors to participate in apprenticeship program.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3071 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.21.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-1-2)
2018-12-17AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (34-3)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S3071 (1R)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (34-3) (Madden)
2018-12-17SenateReconsidered Vote (32-2) (Madden)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (35-0) (Madden)
2018-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-3-2)
2018-10-18AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-03-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1889 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2173 (Carry Over) 2017-02-13 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Sarlo)
S3071 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A3666 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback