NJ A3673 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S489
Note: Carry Foward to future A3551
Note: Carry Over of previous A4756
Note: Carry Over of previous S3172
Note: Carry Foward to future A3551
Note: Carry Over of previous A4756
Note: Carry Over of previous S3172
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school instruction in suicide prevention to be provided in grades kindergarten through 12 and include certain elements.
Title
Requires public school instruction in suicide prevention to be provided in grades kindergarten through 12 and include certain elements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3673 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3673 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S358 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4756 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3172 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3673 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S358 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4756 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3172 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3673 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3673_I1.HTM |