NJ A3688 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1704
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (64-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (64-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Family and Private Burial Grounds Preservation Act."
Title
The "Family and Private Burial Grounds Preservation Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (64-4-0) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S193 (Same As) 2016-09-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1704 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1704 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee