NJ A3755 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires OAL to maintain Internet database summarizing all State rule-making actions.
Title
Requires OAL to maintain Internet database summarizing all State rule-making actions.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] |
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Alison McHose [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Ramos) |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2895 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee