NJ A3811 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires geotechnical testing and certain monitoring of transportation projects.
Title
Requires geotechnical testing and certain monitoring of transportation projects.
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Edward Thomson [R] |
Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-18-1) |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |