NJ A3818 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Substituted by S1301 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-05 - Substituted by S1301 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides unemployment insurance benefits for shared work programs; requires Department of Labor and Workforce Development report.
Title
Provides unemployment insurance benefits for shared work programs; requires Department of Labor and Workforce Development report.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. John DiMaio [R] |
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-05 | Substituted by S1301 (1R) | |
2011-11-28 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1301 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3818 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3818_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3818_R1.HTM |