NJ A3819 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that volunteer firemen appointed to paid positions are not required to be recertified in certain instances.
Title
Establishes that volunteer firemen appointed to paid positions are not required to be recertified in certain instances.
Sponsors
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3124 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee