NJ A3846 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for retained eligibility for members of NJ National Guard or reserve component of US Armed Forces called to active federal military service who met maximum age requirement at closing date of civil service examination.
Title
Provides for retained eligibility for members of NJ National Guard or reserve component of US Armed Forces called to active federal military service who met maximum age requirement at closing date of civil service examination.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Phoebus [R] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. DiAnne Gove [R] |
Rep. Brian Rumpf [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Maria Rodriguez-Gregg [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1856 |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1856 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.54.