NJ A3852 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2934
Note: Carry Over of previous A4911
Note: Carry Over of previous A4911
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Psilocybin Behavioral Health Access and Services Act"; authorizes production and use of psilocybin to promote health and wellness; decriminalizes, and expunges past offenses involving, psilocybin production, possession, use, and distribution.
Title
"Psilocybin Behavioral Health Access and Services Act"; authorizes production and use of psilocybin to promote health and wellness; decriminalizes, and expunges past offenses involving, psilocybin production, possession, use, and distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2283 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2934 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4911 (Carry Over) 2022-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2934 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4911 (Carry Over) 2022-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3852 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3852_I1.HTM |