NJ A3868 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-08 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-08 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurance coverage in the individual and small employer markets and SHBP and SEHBP for "off-label" uses of certain drugs. *
Title
Requires insurance coverage in the individual and small employer markets and SHBP and SEHBP for "off-label" uses of certain drugs. *
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Jack Conners [D] | Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact | |
2011-06-23 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee | |
2011-06-23 | Passed by the Assembly (63-10-5) | |
2011-06-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |