NJ A3893 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-28 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-28 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes uniform real property taxation for commercial renewable energy systems and limits municipal construction permit fees for non-commercial renewable energy systems.*
Title
Establishes uniform real property taxation for commercial renewable energy systems and limits municipal construction permit fees for non-commercial renewable energy systems.*
Sponsors
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-28 | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-23 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chivukula) | |
2011-05-19 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2888 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3893 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3893_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3893_R1.HTM |