NJ A3959 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Hospitality Emergency Loan Program in EDA to provide no-interest loans to qualified small hospitality businesses; makes $100 million appropriation to EDA from federal funds for qualified small business assistance.
Title
Establishes NJ Hospitality Emergency Loan Program in EDA to provide no-interest loans to qualified small hospitality businesses; makes $100 million appropriation to EDA from federal funds for qualified small business assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2371 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2371 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-2) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (37-0) (Gopal) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Substituted for S2371 (2R) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Motion To Table (52-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bergen) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (80-0-0) (Mukherji) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mukherji) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2371 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A3959 (3R)