NJ A3991 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exception from BPU standards for construction and installation of certain solar and photovoltaic electric generation equipment on utility poles by electric public utilities.
Title
Provides exception from BPU standards for construction and installation of certain solar and photovoltaic electric generation equipment on utility poles by electric public utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for S2978 | |
2011-08-25 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-07-07 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Assembly (68-9-1) | |
2011-05-19 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2978 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by A3991 (1R)