NJ A3997 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits inclusion of bonus in employment contract of school superintendent for reducing number of out-of-district placements of students with special education needs.
Title
Prohibits inclusion of bonus in employment contract of school superintendent for reducing number of out-of-district placements of students with special education needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3076 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3076 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.187. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-1) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S3076 |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3076 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A3997