NJ A4021 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2007
Note: Carry Over of previous A3581
Note: Carry Over of previous A3581
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid coverage for community violence prevention services; Requires DOH to approve training and certification program for violence prevention professionals.
Title
Requires Medicaid coverage for community violence prevention services; Requires DOH to approve training and certification program for violence prevention professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1407 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2007 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3581 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2007 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3581 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4021 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4021_I1.HTM |