NJ A4044 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Wage Transparency Act"; requires reporting of public contractor employment information.
Title
"Wage Transparency Act"; requires reporting of public contractor employment information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-26-2) |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2761 (Same As) 2013-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee