NJ A4103 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3628
Note: Carry Over of previous A5141
Note: Carry Over of previous A5141
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons diagnosed with Irritable Bowel Disease, Irritable Bowel Syndrome, or Crohn's disease to receive parking privileges reserved for persons with disability.
Title
Allows persons diagnosed with Irritable Bowel Disease, Irritable Bowel Syndrome, or Crohn's disease to receive parking privileges reserved for persons with disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S689 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3628 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5141 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3628 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5141 (Carry Over) 2023-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A4103 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4500/4103_I1.HTM |