NJ A4291 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands circumstances under which prevailing wage must be paid.
Title
Expands circumstances under which prevailing wage must be paid.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-6-0) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4291 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee