NJ A4439 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1496
Note: Carry Foward to future A2188
Note: Carry Foward to future A2188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale and distribution of mercury relays and switches under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits sale and distribution of mercury relays and switches under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4439 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
A4439 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)
A4439 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0)