NJ A4525 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Vetoed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-04 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands opportunities for restaurants, bars, distilleries and breweries to provide outdoor dining and permits certain farms to adjust operations in response to COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
Expands opportunities for restaurants, bars, distilleries and breweries to provide outdoor dining and permits certain farms to adjust operations in response to COVID-19 public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3128 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3128 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3128 (1R) |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2980 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3128 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4525 (2R)
S3128 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4525 (2R)