NJ A4526 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S374 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S374 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from sales tax cosmetic makeup services provided in conjunction with reconstructive breast surgery; designated as "Jen's Law."
Title
Exempts from sales tax cosmetic makeup services provided in conjunction with reconstructive breast surgery; designated as "Jen's Law."
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Caroline Casagrande [R] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S374 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-12-16 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S374 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.193.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A4526 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A5000/4526_I1.HTM |