NJ A4639 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3083
Note: Carry Foward to future S2286
Note: Carry Foward to future S2286
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3071 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3071 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Mike Adler Aphasia Task Force to assess needs of persons with aphasia, and their families, and ensure adequate provision of support services and information thereto.*
Title
Establishes Mike Adler Aphasia Task Force to assess needs of persons with aphasia, and their families, and ensure adequate provision of support services and information thereto.*
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Scott Rumana [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S3071 (2R) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4639 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3071 (2R)
A4639 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3071 (2R)
S3071 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4639 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3071 (2R)
S3071 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session