NJ A4713 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2600
Note: Carry Foward to future S1518
Note: Carry Foward to future S1518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Townhouse Fire Safety Act"; requires automatic fire sprinkler systems in new townhomes.
Title
"New Townhouse Fire Safety Act"; requires automatic fire sprinkler systems in new townhomes.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3252 (1R) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4713 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
A4713 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
S3252 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4713 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3252 (1R)
S3252 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session