NJ A4717 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4050
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S92 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S92 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of Protect Pollinators license plates.
Title
Authorizes issuance of Protect Pollinators license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S92 (1R) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S92 (Same As) 2021-10-27 - Approved P.L.2021, c.254.
S4050 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S4050 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee