NJ A4721 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.95.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes CBT surtax at rate of 2.5 percent until December 31, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes CBT surtax at rate of 2.5 percent until December 31, 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2934 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.95.
2020-09-24SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-17)
2020-09-24SenateSubstituted for S2934
2020-09-24SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (42-35-1)
2020-09-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2934 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by A4721

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback