NJ A4997 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies procedures for approval of environmental and transportation infrastructure projects.
Title
Clarifies procedures for approval of environmental and transportation infrastructure projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S3242 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3242 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.144.