NJ A501 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3481
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S1163 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S1163 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain requirements for use of restraint and seclusion on students with disabilities in school districts, educational services commissions, and approved private schools for students with disabilities.*
Title
Establishes certain requirements for use of restraint and seclusion on students with disabilities in school districts, educational services commissions, and approved private schools for students with disabilities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S1163 (2R) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3481 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1163 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
S1163 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)