NJ A5390 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2861 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2861 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns certain restrictive covenants on real property.
Title
Concerns certain restrictive covenants on real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2861 (2R) |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2861 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.274.