NJ A5503 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes open enrollment period under Individual Health Coverage Program.
Title
Establishes open enrollment period under Individual Health Coverage Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3806 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.357. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S3806 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-2) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3806 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5503