NJ A5826 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - Approved P.L.2023, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - Approved P.L.2023, c.260.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and clarifies certain expungement procedures.
Title
Revises and clarifies certain expungement procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-12 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.260. |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-3-0) |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-14) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S4211 (1R) |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-3-0) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4211 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5826 (2R)