NJ A605 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4622
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2507 (SS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2507 (SS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale or lease of access to certain dental provider network contracts.*
Title
Prohibits sale or lease of access to certain dental provider network contracts.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2507 (SS/1R) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4622 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2507 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.254.
S2507 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.254.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A605 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A1000/605_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A605 |