NJ A6056 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1595
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3422 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3422 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires declaration of Code Blue alert when National Weather Service predicts temperatures of 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower.
Title
Requires declaration of Code Blue alert when National Weather Service predicts temperatures of 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Gregory McGuckin [R] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S3422 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6056 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3422 (1R)
S3422 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.427.
S3422 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.427.