NJ A837 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4088
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.69.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.69.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Hazardous Drug Safe Handling Act;" requires promulgation of standards and regulations concerning safe handling of hazardous drugs by certain health care personnel.*
Title
Establishes "Hazardous Drug Safe Handling Act;" requires promulgation of standards and regulations concerning safe handling of hazardous drugs by certain health care personnel.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S468 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S468 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.69. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted for S468 (2R) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-1) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jimenez) |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4088 (Carry Over) 2015-01-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S468 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A837 (3R)
S468 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A837 (3R)