NJ ACR60 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes Congress and President to enact "National Pediatric Acquired Brain Injury Plan Act of 2011."
Title
Memorializes Congress and President to enact "National Pediatric Acquired Brain Injury Plan Act of 2011."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr76 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr76 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for SCR76 (1R) |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR76 (Same As) 2012-06-25 - Substituted by ACR60 (1R)