NJ AJR27 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, JR-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, JR-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November 15 of each year as "Patient Advocate Day."
Title
Designates November 15 of each year as "Patient Advocate Day."
Sponsors
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, JR-17. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-4) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/AJR27 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/AJR/27_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR27 |