NJ AJR53 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by SJR96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by SJR96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "Disability Employment Awareness Month."
Title
Designates October of each year as "Disability Employment Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR96 |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR127 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
SJR96 (Same As) 2018-10-31 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-11.
SJR96 (Same As) 2018-10-31 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-11.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR53 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/53_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR53 |