NJ AJR83 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR25
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR72
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR72
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first full week of May of each year as "Teacher Appreciation Week."
Title
Designates first full week of May of each year as "Teacher Appreciation Week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR25 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SJR72 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SJR93 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SJR72 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SJR93 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/AJR83 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/AJR/83_I1.HTM |