NJ S1140 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A271
Note: Carry Foward to future S1987
Note: Carry Over of previous A3765
Note: Carry Over of previous S4173
Note: Carry Foward to future S1987
Note: Carry Over of previous A3765
Note: Carry Over of previous S4173
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits victims and witnesses of human trafficking to testify in criminal proceedings via closed circuit television; permits judge to make motion to seek closed circuit testimony.
Title
Permits victims and witnesses of human trafficking to testify in criminal proceedings via closed circuit television; permits judge to make motion to seek closed circuit testimony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1140 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1140 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3765 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4173 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2634 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1140 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3765 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S4173 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2634 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1140 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1140_I1.HTM |