NJ S1152 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Division on Women to conduct an audit of the coordination of community responses to domestic violence.
Title
Directs the Division on Women to conduct an audit of the coordination of community responses to domestic violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2899 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2899 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.246.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S1152 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S1500/1152_I1.HTM |