NJ S1171 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.200.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits genital mutilation of females under 18 years of age.
Title
Prohibits genital mutilation of females under 18 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2601 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2601 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.200. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A2601 |
2013-12-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2601 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S1171