NJ S1239 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3588
Note: Carry Over of previous A5211
Note: Carry Over of previous A5211
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes imposition of fee for connection to municipal electric distribution system.
Title
Authorizes imposition of fee for connection to municipal electric distribution system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5131 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5131 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.270. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-6-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5131 |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3588 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5131 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S1239
A5211 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A5131 (Same As) 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S1239
A5211 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee